EP0054985 - Apparatus for manually cocking an automatic firearm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1985 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1985 [1985/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Werkzeugmaschinenfabrik Oerlikon-Bührle AG Birchstrasse 155 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | For all designated states Werkzeugmaschinenfabrik Oerlikon-Bührle AG Birchstrasse 155 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kocher, Willi Zurlindenstrasse 110 CH-8003 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Zimmermann, Jakob Churerstrasse 95 CH-8808 Pfäffikon / CH | [1982/26] | Application number, filing date | 81201227.6 | 30.10.1981 | [1982/26] | Priority number, date | CH19800009341 | 18.12.1980 Original published format: CH 934180 | [1982/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054985 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0054985 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F41D11/00 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
F41A7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1982/26] | Title | German: | Handspannvorrichtung für eine selbsttätige Feuerwaffe | [1982/26] | English: | Apparatus for manually cocking an automatic firearm | [1982/26] | French: | Dispositif pour armer manuellement une arme à feu automatique | [1982/26] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 28.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE721590 [ ] (RHEINMETALL BORSIG AG); | DE954824 [ ] (WINDEN U MASCHB JOSEF GRESSBAC); | GB963119 [ ] (BREVETS AERO MECANIQUES); | CH459000 [ ] (STONER EUGEN MORRISON [US]) |