EP0032424 - Apparatus for developing latent images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopko, John J. 1381 Willowdale Drive Macedon New York 14502 / US | 02 /
Hays, Dan A. 297 Mason Road Fairport New York 14450 / US | [1981/29] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | [1983/52] |
Former [1981/29] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300054.4 | 07.01.1981 | [1981/29] | Priority number, date | US19800111450 | 11.01.1980 Original published format: US 111450 | [1981/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032424 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032424 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
G03G15/0813 (EP);
G03G15/754 (EP);
G03G2215/0607 (EP);
G03G2215/0648 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/29] | Title | German: | Entwicklungsvorrichtung für latente Bilder | [1981/29] | English: | Apparatus for developing latent images | [1981/29] | French: | Dispositif de développement d'images latentes | [1981/29] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 18.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0019485 [ ]; | US3974952 [ ]; | US3880518 [ ]; | US4013041 [ ]; | GB1549413 [ ] | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, No. 183, July 1979, page 352 Havant Hants, G.B. J. SWAPCEINSKI: "Development apparatus which compensates for nap contour variations". |