EP0057299 - Dehydrated beef products, a method for preparing them and meat products containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROTEIN FOODS (U.K.) LIMITED Factory Road Tipton Staffordshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/32] | For all designated states PROTEIN FOODS (U.K.) LIMITED Factory Road Tipton Staffordshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whittle, Mark Thomas Garden Cottage Farmcote Nr. Bridgnorth Shropshire / GB | [1982/32] | Representative(s) | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [1982/32] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300298.7 | 22.01.1981 | [1982/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0057299 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/31 | [1982/32] | CPC: |
A23B4/03 (EP);
A23L13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/32] | Title | German: | Dehydratisierte Rindfleisch-Produkte, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Fleischprodukte | [1982/32] | English: | Dehydrated beef products, a method for preparing them and meat products containing them | [1982/32] | French: | Produits de boeuf déshydratés, procédé pour leur fabrication et produits de viande les contenant | [1982/32] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/42] | 22.07.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.02.1983 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT336382B [ ]; | [A]US4163804 ; | [A]FR2412266 |