EP0033644 - Intermetallic connector finishes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waine, Cathryn Antoinette 35 Stratton Green Aylesbury Buckinghamshire / GB | 02 /
Pedder, David John 19 Hamilton Road Summertown Oxford / GB | 03 /
Souter, John William 'Autumn' Hannington Northampton / GB | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher The Plessey Company plc Beeston Nottingham NG9 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | Goodman, Christopher The Plessey Company plc Beeston Nottingham NG9 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300397.7 | 30.01.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | GB19800003847 | 05.02.1980 Original published format: GB 8003847 | [1981/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033644 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C25D7/00, C25D3/56, C25D5/10, H01B1/02, H01R13/00, H01H1/02 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
C25D7/00 (EP,US);
C25D5/10 (EP,US);
C25D5/50 (EP);
H01B1/02 (EP);
H01R13/03 (EP);
C25D3/60 (EP);
C25D3/64 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/32] | Title | German: | Intermetallische Kontaktelementauflage | [1981/32] | English: | Intermetallic connector finishes | [1981/32] | French: | Couche de finition intermétallique d'un connecteur | [1981/32] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 03.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/15] | 26.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH408582 [ ] (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]); | US3562467 [ ] (MOORADIAN VICTOR G); | CH506174 [ ] (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]); | US3598550 [ ] (TAKAHASHI CHOICHIRO, et al); | US4069370 [ ] (HARMSEN NILS, et al); | DE2540944 [ ]; | US4141727 [ ] (SHIDA SANKICHI, et al) |