EP0034428 - A method of resolving optical isomers of 2,2-dimethyl-3-(2,2-dichlorovinyl) cyclopropanecarboxylic acid and a novel salt used in this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/34] | A method of preparing an optically active cyclo-propanecarboxylic acid and a novel salt used in this method | ||
[1983/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1984 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Yukio 10-2-241, Sonehigashinocho 2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | [1981/34] | Representative(s) | Tubby, David George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | Tubby, David George, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300416.5 | 02.02.1981 | [1981/34] | Priority number, date | JP19800011313 | 31.01.1980 Original published format: JP 1131380 | [1981/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034428 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034428 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034428 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07B19/00, C07C51/487, C07C61/40, C07C87/28 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
C07C51/487 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/487, C07C61/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von optischen Isomeren der 2,2-dimethyl-3-(2,2-dichlorovinyl) Cyclopropancarbonsäure und ein in diesem Verfahren verwendetes Salz | [1983/39] | English: | A method of resolving optical isomers of 2,2-dimethyl-3-(2,2-dichlorovinyl) cyclopropanecarboxylic acid and a novel salt used in this method | [1983/39] | French: | Procédé de réduction d'isomères optiques de l'acide 2,2-diméthyl-3-(2,2-dichlorovinyl) cyclopropanecarboxylique et sel utilisé dans ce procédé | [1983/39] |
Former [1981/34] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer optisch aktiven Cyclopropancarbonsäure und ein in diesem Verfahren verwendetes Salz | ||
Former [1981/34] | A method of preparing an optically active cyclo-propanecarboxylic acid and a novel salt used in this method | ||
Former [1981/34] | Procédé de préparation d'un acide cyclopropanecarboxylique optiquement actif et sel utilisé dans ce procédé | Examination procedure | 08.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 31.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2008589 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | FR2427321 [ ] (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | DE2251097 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | Examination | EP0006187 |