EP0035326 - Decoder circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.10.1985 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isogai, Hideaki 11-13, Minamisawa 4-chome Higashikurume-shi Tokyo 180-03 / JP | [1981/36] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/36] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300487.6 | 05.02.1981 | [1981/36] | Priority number, date | JP19800014576 | 08.02.1980 Original published format: JP 1457680 | [1981/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0035326 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0035326 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/00, G11C11/40, H03K13/25 | [1981/36] | CPC: |
H03M7/005 (EP,US);
G11C11/415 (EP,US);
G11C8/10 (EP,US);
G11C8/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/45] |
Former [1981/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Decoderschaltung | [1981/36] | English: | Decoder circuit | [1981/36] | French: | Circuit de décodage | [1981/36] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LU, SE | 12.08.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/17] | 14.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1985/51] | 12.07.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.03.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.03.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.03.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 05.03.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.03.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 05.03.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3736574 (GERSBACH J); | US4007451 [ ] (HEUBER KLAUS, et al); | [P]EP0019988 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [P]DE2904457 (SIEMENS AG); | [E]EP0024894 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US4027285 (MILLHOLLAN MICHAEL S, et al); | [A]DE2658523 (SIEMENS AG) | [ ] - IEEE Transactions on Electron Devices, Vol. ED-26, No. 6, June 1979, pages 886-892 New York, U.S.A. K. KAWARADA et al.: "A 4K-Bit Static I2L Memory" * pages 889-890paragraph "D. New Decoder Circuit"; figures 6,7 * | [ ] - IEEE Journal of Solid-State Circuits, Vol. SC-14, No. 5, October 1979, pages 850-854 New York, U.S.A. H. GLOCK et al.: "An ECL 100K-Compatible 1024 X 4 Bit RAM with 15 ns Access Time" * pages 851-852paragraph "F Address Decoder"; figures 4,5 | [ ] - IEEE Journal of Solid-State Circuits, Vol. SC-15, No. 3, June 1980, pages 306-310 New YorkU.S.A. H. ERNST et al.: "A High-Speed ECL 100K Compatible 64 X 4 Bit RAM with 6 ns Access Time" * figure 2 * | [ ] - Intel Data Sheet, December 1970, 15 pages, Intel Editor Mountain ViewU.S.A. "Partially Decoded Ramdom Access 265 Bit Bipolar Memory (3102) and Binary Decoder-Driver (3202)" * pages 1,10 * | [ ] - IEEE International Solid-State Circuits Conference, 16th February 1978, pages 154-155 New YorkU.S.A. P.M. QUINN et al.: "A 16K x 113L Dynamic RAM" | [ ] - IEEE Journal of Solid-State Circuits, Vol. SC-13, No. 5, October 1978, Pages 656-663 New YorkU.S.A. K. KAWARADA et al.: "A Fast 7.5 ns Access IK-Bit RAM for Cache-Memory Systems" |