EP0034052 - A recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCESS SHIZAI CO. LTD. No. 10-5, Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1981/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashi, Kashiwagi No. 4-36, Nishihara-cho 4-chome Tanashi-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nobuyuki, Inoue No. 18-25, Mejiro 5-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/41] | Carpenter, David MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1981/33] | Roberts, Peter William Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300501.4 | 06.02.1981 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | JP19800013017 | 07.02.1980 Original published format: JP 1301780 | JP19800172643 | 09.12.1980 Original published format: JP 17264380 | [1981/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034052 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034052 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034052 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26, G03F7/10 | [1981/33] | CPC: |
B41M5/368 (EP,US);
G03F7/0215 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31623 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31685 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31768 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31775 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1981/33] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1981/33] | English: | A recording medium | [1981/33] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement | [1981/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1981 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 11.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.11.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1992/36] | DE | 01.11.1985 | |
GB | 06.02.1986 | ||
Former [1989/27] | GB | 06.02.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1039835 (BAYER AG); | [A]US4117039 (GATES ALLEN PETER, et al); | [A]CH606196 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [YD]EP0007784 (PROCESS SHIZAI [JP]); | [X]US2948706 (WOLF-DIETRICH SCHELLENBERG, et al); | [X]GB1422698 (NORLAND PRODUCTS INC); | [X]FR1446213 (AGFA GEVAERT); | [X]GB1108815 (AGFA GEVAERT NV) | [X] - PHOTOGRAPHIC ABSTRACTS, Part 2, 1979, Abstract No. 678 London (GB) N.F. KAZANSKAYA et al.: "Application of Immobilized Light-Sensitive Enzyme Systems in Photography" page 49. |