Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE4440T | 15.08.1983 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP81300653 | 18.02.1981 | GB8005826 | 21.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0034912 | Global Dossier | 17.08.1983 | B1 | EP0034912 | 02.09.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8005826 | 21.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3160759D1 | 22.09.1983 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8005826 | 21.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4385404 | 31.05.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8005826 | 21.02.1980 |