EP0037168 - Shape selective reactions with group IB modified zeolite catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1985 [1985/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Chin Chiun 6 Nathan Drive North Brunswick New Jersey 08902 / US | [1981/40] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1983/17] |
Former [1981/40] | Cooper, John Anthony Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300681.4 | 19.02.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | US19800153364 | 27.03.1980 Original published format: US 153364 | [1981/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037168 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037168 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/66, C07C2/86, C07C6/06, C07C6/12, C07C15/04, C07C15/08, B01J29/08, B01J29/18, B01J29/28 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
B01J29/44 (EP,US);
B01J29/46 (EP,US);
C07C2/66 (EP,US);
C07C2/864 (EP,US);
C07C6/123 (EP,US);
C07C6/126 (EP,US);
B01J2229/26 (EP,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US);
B01J29/65 (EP,US);
B01J29/70 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
C07C2529/65 (EP,US);
C07C2529/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/66, C07C15/02 (EP,US);
C07C2/864, C07C15/02 (US,EP);
C07C6/126, C07C15/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/40] | Title | German: | Ausführung selektiver Reaktionen mit zeolithischen Katalysatoren, die mit Metallen der Gruppe I B modifiziert sind | [1981/40] | English: | Shape selective reactions with group IB modified zeolite catalysts | [1981/40] | French: | Méthode donnant lieu à des réactions sélectives avec des catalyseurs de zéolithes modifiés par des métaux du groupe I B | [1981/40] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/51] | 30.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP54106436 [ ]; | GB2018232 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 3, No. 128, 24 October 1979 page 27C62, & JP-A-54 106 436., & JP54106436 A 19791024 | Examination | GB2033358 | US4097367 | US4128504 | US4157293 |