EP0035917 - A photosensitive composition, an article comprising the composition and the use of the composition as a photoresist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1985 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1981/37] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutton, Richard Calvin Kodak Park Rochester New York / US | 02 /
Martin, Thomas William Kodak Park Rochester New York / US | [1981/37] | Representative(s) | Pepper, John Herbert, et al KODAK LIMITED Patent Department P.O. Box 114 190 High Holborn London WC1V 7EA / GB | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/37] | Trangmar, Leigh Alan 66 The Avenue Beckenham Kent / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301020.4 | 11.03.1981 | [1981/37] | Priority number, date | US19800129523 | 12.03.1980 Original published format: US 129523 | [1981/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0035917 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0035917 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035917 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/66, G03C1/71, G03C7/12, G03F7/26 | [1981/37] | CPC: |
G03F7/04 (EP,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,US);
Y10S430/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/37] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung, die Zusammensetzung enthaltender Artikel und Verwendung der Zusammensetzung als Photoresistmaterial | [1981/37] | English: | A photosensitive composition, an article comprising the composition and the use of the composition as a photoresist | [1981/37] | French: | Composition photosensible, article renferment la composition et utilisation de la composition comme photorésist | [1981/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 13.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2604388 (STAEHLE HENRY C); | [AD]US4190446 (MARTIN THOMAS W [US], et al) |