EP0036730 - Bicyclooctane derivatives, processes for producing them, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, their use as pharmaceuticals and precursors thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Keiichi 5-3-530, Higashiawaji-1-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Sugie, Akihiko 10-1-116, Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | 03 /
Kawakami, Hajime 14-7, Mefu-2-chome Takarazuka-shi / JP | 04 /
Sami, Shunsuke 10-4-456 Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | 05 /
Kojima, Atsuyuki 21-4, Izumicho Takarazuka-shi / JP | 06 /
Katsube, Junki 10-20, Machikaneyamacho Toyonaka-shi / JP | [1981/39] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1981/39] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301063.4 | 13.03.1981 | [1981/39] | Priority number, date | JP19800036720 | 21.03.1980 Original published format: JP 3672080 | JP19800093664 | 08.07.1980 Original published format: JP 9366480 | [1981/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0036730 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0036730 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036730 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/18, C07C59/00, C07C69/66, C07C91/00, C07C93/00, C07C47/00, C07D211/14, C07C121/75, C07C103/30, // C07C177/00, A61K31/00, A61K31/557 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C29/095 (EP,US);
C07C29/1285 (EP,US);
C07C35/32 (EP,US);
C07C405/0083 (EP,US);
C07C43/196 (EP,US);
C07D211/32 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
C07B2200/09 (EP,US);
C07C2602/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/095, C07C35/32 (US,EP);
C07C29/1285, C07C35/32 (US,EP);
C07C29/143, C07C35/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/39] | Title | German: | Bicyclooctan-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen, ihre pharmazeutische Verwendung und Zwischenprodukte | [1981/39] | English: | Bicyclooctane derivatives, processes for producing them, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, their use as pharmaceuticals and precursors thereof | [1981/39] | French: | Dérivés bicyclooctane, procédés pour leur préparation, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant, leur utilisation comme produits pharmaceutiques et précurseurs | [1981/39] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 29.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2017699 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO) |