EP0037678 - Improved radioactive iodine seed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1985 [1985/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubiatowicz, David O. 2501 Hudson Road P. O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81301259.8 | 24.03.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | US19800138293 | 08.04.1980 Original published format: US 138293 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037678 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037678 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, G21G4/08 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
G21G4/08 (EP,US);
A61N5/1027 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/41] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Jod-Strahlungsquelle | [1981/41] | English: | Improved radioactive iodine seed | [1981/41] | French: | Semence d'implantation à l'iode | [1981/41] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 29.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3351049 [ ] (LAWRENCE DONALD C) | Examination | DE1016855 | US1565490 | GB1018723 | CH225654 |