Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0036787 | Global Dossier | 12.06.1985 | B1 | EP0036787 | 30.09.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8010105 | 26.03.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3170925D1 | 18.07.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8010105 | 26.03.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4551731 | 05.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8010105 | 26.03.1980 |