Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1985 [1985/32] |
02.06.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |
30.10.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.12.1981 [1981/52] |
15.08.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.10.1981 [1981/41] |