Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE8779T | 15.08.1984 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP81301428 | 02.04.1981 | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE888252 | 02.10.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS222694 | 29.07.1983 | B2 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2073194 | 19.10.1983 | B | GB2073194 | 14.10.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU185038 | 28.11.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0214328B | 06.04.1990 | B2 | JPS56154472 | 30.11.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX6554E | 10.07.1985 | E | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | MX18667581 | 02.04.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SU1099844 | 23.06.1984 | A3 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA811691 | 27.10.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU543800B | Global Dossier | 02.05.1985 | B2 | AU6860481 | 08.10.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0037710 | Global Dossier | 01.08.1984 | B1 | EP0037710 | 14.10.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR227304 | 15.10.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1152083 | 16.08.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1154680 | 04.10.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH652715 | 29.11.1985 | A5 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3165175D1 | 06.09.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK147913C | 22.07.1985 | C | DK147913B | 07.01.1985 | B | DK135081 | 04.10.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DOP1981002974 | 19.07.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8201993 | 16.01.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI73985C | 10.12.1987 | C | FI73985B | 31.08.1987 | B | FI811019L | 04.10.1981 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2479820 | 03.02.1984 | B1 | FR2479820 | 09.10.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR74148 | 06.06.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE51132 | 15.10.1986 | B1 | IE810760L | 03.10.1981 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL62400 | 30.04.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN151559 | 21.05.1983 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1144691 | 29.10.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR850000011B | 08.02.1985 | B1 | KR830005176 | 03.08.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU83273 | 23.07.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO154965C | 21.01.1987 | C | NO154965B | 13.10.1986 | B | NO811134L | 05.10.1981 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ196555 | 06.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH16437 | 07.10.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH16493 | 28.10.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL129322B | 31.05.1984 | B1 | PL230483 | 03.01.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT72756 | 23.03.1982 | B | PT72756 | 01.04.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4356185 | 26.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4385059 | 24.05.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | YU42391 | 31.08.1988 | B | YU87481 | 30.09.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8011251 | 03.04.1980 | GB8013860 | 26.04.1980 |