Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
28.08.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] |
09.09.1989 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] |
17.10.1985 | Opposition filed | published on 18.12.1985 [1985/51] |
10.11.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.01.1985 [1985/02] |
30.09.1982 | Change - applicant | published on 01.12.1982 [1982/48] |
15.04.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.06.1982 [1982/24] |
04.09.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.11.1981 [1981/44] |