EP0038172 - A process for preparing artificial red cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Thomas Arthur 1101 Raritan Road Scotch Plains New Jersey / US | 02 /
Asher, William Johnston 12 Byron Lane Fanwood New Jersey / US | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | Field, Roger Norton, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Field, Roger Norton (GB), et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1981/42] | Field, Roger Norton ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301535.1 | 08.04.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | US19800139479 | 11.04.1980 Original published format: US 139479 | [1981/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038172 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038172 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038172 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50, A61K37/14 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
A61K35/18 (EP,US);
A61K9/5068 (EP,US);
A61M1/3692 (EP,US);
C07K14/805 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von künstlichen roten Zellen | [1981/42] | English: | A process for preparing artificial red cells | [1981/42] | French: | Procédé de préparation de cellules rouges artificielles | [1981/42] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 02.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4001401 (BONSEN PIETER, et al); | [AD]US4133874 (MILLER IRVING F, et al); | [A]GB1540461 (DAMON CORP) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 2, 10th July 1978, page 363, No. 12043s Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. M. ARAKAWA et al.: "Some Biophysical and Biochemical Properties of Poly(phtaloyl 6-lysine) Microcapsules Containing Hemolysate" & Can. J. Physiol. Pharmacol. 1977, 55(6), 1378-1382 |