EP0037743 - Fabrication of panels, binders, trays, frames, boxes and other assemblies from sheet material and channel-shaped edging strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1989 [1989/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECORDEX LIMITED PO Box 71 Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states RECORDEX LIMITED PO Box 71 Road Town Tortola / VG | ||
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states Ryan, Keith 121 Parkside Way Harrow Middlesex HA2 6DB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Keith 121 Parkside Way Harrow, Middlesex HA2 6DB / GB | [1988/20] |
Former [1981/41] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1985/44] | Warren, Stanley Francis Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1981/41] | Saunders, Henry Edmund Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301539.3 | 08.04.1981 | [1981/41] | Priority number, date | GB19800011480 | 08.04.1980 Original published format: GB 8011480 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037743 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037743 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B42D1/08, B42F15/00, B42F11/00 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
B42F15/00 (EP,US);
B42D1/08 (EP,US);
B42F11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/41] | Title | German: | Verfertigung von Paneelen, Heftern, Karteien, Rahmen, Dosen und anderen Komplexen aus Bogenmaterial und kanalförmige Randstreifen | [1981/41] | English: | Fabrication of panels, binders, trays, frames, boxes and other assemblies from sheet material and channel-shaped edging strips | [1981/41] | French: | Fabrication de panneaux, classeurs, casiers, cadres, boîtes et autres assemblages à partir d'un matériau en feuille et bandes de bordure en forme de canal | [1981/41] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 23.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.10.1988 | [1989/24] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2058497 [ ] (POULET JEAN CLAUDE); | FR2142337 [ ] (LANGHORST CARSTEN); | US3793758 [ ] (FELDHUSEN J, et al); | DE2505025 [ ] (BRUEGMANN DIRK A); | FR2351799 [ ] (PLANCHE JULES JEAN [FR]); | FR2358277 [ ] (PLANCHE JULES JEAN [FR]) | Examination | US2777232 | GB812469 | US3060606 | US3200526 |