EP0038174 - Process of forming a magnetic toner resist using a transfer member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1985 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1986 [1986/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nacci, George Raymond 2103 Inglewood Drive Fairfax Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1981/42] | Application number, filing date | 81301542.7 | 08.04.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | US19800139110 | 10.04.1980 Original published format: US 139110 | [1981/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038174 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038174 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038174 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03G19/00 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
G03G19/00 (EP,US);
H05K3/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1981/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines magnetischen Tonerresists unter Verwendung einer Übertragungsvorrichtung | [1981/42] | English: | Process of forming a magnetic toner resist using a transfer member | [1981/42] | French: | Procédé de formation d'un résist à toner magnétique en employant un moyen de transfert | [1981/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/27] | 26.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2947625 [ ] (BERTELSEN BRUCE I); | US3705797 [ ] (MIHAJLOV VSEVOLOD S, et al); | US3315600 [ ] (MARTHA TOMANEK); | EP0004383 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | FR1408105 [ ] (KALLE AG); | FR1179244 [ ] (IBM); | US3469982 [ ] (CELESTE JACK RICHARD); | US3851964 [ ] (SMITH I, et al); | DE1804483 [ ] (XEROX CORP); | US3716360 [ ] (FUKUSHIMA O, et al); | US4066802 [ ] (CLEMENS CARL F) |