EP0038650 - Production line systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALL AUTOMATION LIMITED Marconi House New Street Chelmsford Essex CM1 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states HALL AUTOMATION LIMITED Marconi House New Street Chelmsford Essex CM1 1PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hall, Douglas Cresswell 3, Canons Close Radlett Hertfordshire / GB | [1981/43] | Representative(s) | Hooper, John Peter Lindesay Marconi House New Street Chelmsford, Essex CM1 1PL / GB | [1981/43] | Application number, filing date | 81301547.6 | 08.04.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | GB19800012644 | 17.04.1980 Original published format: GB 8012644 | [1981/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038650 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/04, B05B13/06, B25J9/00 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
B05B13/0609 (EP);
B05B13/0452 (EP);
B25J9/0093 (EP);
G05B2219/42186 (EP);
G05B2219/45013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1981/43] | Title | German: | Produktionsanlagen | [1981/43] | English: | Production line systems | [1981/43] | French: | Lignes de production | [1981/43] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/01] | 06.10.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2002142 [ ]; | GB2013934 [ ]; | FR2397234 [ ]; | JPS52117938 [ ]; | US3283918 [ ]; | JPS533438 [ ]; | US3952699 [ ] |