Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0038654 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8012644 | 17.04.1980 | GB8100482 | 08.01.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2075217 | 13.07.1983 | B | GB2075217 | 11.11.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8012644 | 17.04.1980 | GB8100482 | 08.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0038650 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8012644 | 17.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2078139 | 09.11.1983 | B | GB2078139 | 06.01.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8012644 | 17.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS56161860 | 12.12.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8012644 | 17.04.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS56163850 | 16.12.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8012644 | 17.04.1980 |