EP0040470 - Aqueous developable photosensitive composition and printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/47] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Incremona, Joseph H. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1981/47] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/47] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81301599.7 | 10.04.1981 | [1981/47] | Priority number, date | US19800145025 | 30.04.1980 Original published format: US 145025 | [1981/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0040470 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0040470 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040470 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/08 | [1981/47] | CPC: |
G03F7/0212 (EP);
C08G18/0828 (EP);
H01C7/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/47] | Title | German: | Mit einer wässrigen Lösung entwickelbare lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung und Druckplatte | [1981/47] | English: | Aqueous developable photosensitive composition and printing plate | [1981/47] | French: | Composition photosensible développable à l'eau et plaque d'impression | [1981/47] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/13] | 08.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3679419 [ ] (GILLICH THOMAS N); | US4123276 [ ] (KITA NOBUYUKI, et al); | UST876010I [ ]; | FR2262813 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | FR2048536 [ ] (AZOPLATE CORP) | Examination | USH876010H |