EP0039172 - A process for removing CO from a gas stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/44] | Cu(1) acetylacetonate complexes for CO separation | ||
[1984/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doyle, Gerald Box 20 RD 1 Whitehouse Station New Jersey / US | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Field, Roger Norton, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Field, Roger Norton (GB), et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1981/44] | Field, Roger Norton ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301643.3 | 14.04.1981 | [1981/44] | Priority number, date | US19800141055 | 17.04.1980 Original published format: US 141055 | [1981/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039172 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039172 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, C10K1/12 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von CO aus einem Gasstrom | [1984/11] | English: | A process for removing CO from a gas stream | [1984/11] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation de CO à partir de mélanges gazeux | [1984/11] |
Former [1981/44] | Cu(I)-Acetylacetonat-Komplexe zur Abtrennung von CO | ||
Former [1981/44] | Cu(1) acetylacetonate complexes for CO separation | ||
Former [1981/44] | Complexes de Cu(I)-acétylacétonate pour la séparation de CO | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/25] | 12.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4048292 [ ] (GREEN RALPH V); | US4042669 [ ] (JOHNSON MARVIN M, et al); | FR1191629 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | US3360536 [ ] (MCKEON JAMES E, et al) |