EP0039204 - Devices for the gasification of liquids and liquid treatment plants including said devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 12.04.1989 [1989/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VENTURATOR LIMITED 129 High Street Guildford Surrey / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | For all designated states VENTURATOR LIMITED 129 High Street Guildford Surrey / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Todd, John James 11 Overbrook West Horsley Surrey / GB | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301788.6 | 23.04.1981 | [1981/44] | Priority number, date | GB19800014056 | 29.04.1980 Original published format: GB 8014056 | GB19800017374 | 27.05.1980 Original published format: GB 8017374 | [1981/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0039204 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0039204 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039204 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, C02F7/00 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
C02F3/1257 (EP);
B01F35/712 (EP,US);
A01K63/042 (EP);
B01F23/232311 (EP);
B01F35/3203 (EP);
B01F35/71 (EP);
B01F35/71805 (EP,US);
C02F3/20 (EP);
C02F3/223 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT, NL, SE [1981/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Begasen von Flüssigkeiten und Anlagen zur Flüssigkeitsbehandlung, die diese Vorrichtung enthalten | [1981/44] | English: | Devices for the gasification of liquids and liquid treatment plants including said devices | [1981/44] | French: | Dispositif de gazéification de liquides et installations de traitement de liquides comprenant ce dispositif | [1981/44] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/51] | 20.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.1985 | SE | 30.04.1985 | NL | 01.11.1985 | DE | 01.01.1986 | [1989/15] |
Former [1988/13] | AT | 03.04.1985 | |
SE | 30.04.1985 | ||
NL | 01.11.1985 | ||
Former [1986/45] | AT | 03.04.1985 | |
NL | 01.11.1985 | ||
Former [1986/32] | NL | 01.11.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3336016 (AUGUST SCHREIBER); | [A]DE2210185 (KIRCHES HUBERT); | [A]US3797809 (SYDNOR G) | Examination | GB1482191 |