EP0039586 - Hydraulic pressure control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1985 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORMALAIR-GARRETT (HOLDINGS) LIMITED Box 206, Westland Works Yeovil Somerset, BA20 2YB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/45] | For all designated states NORMALAIR-GARRETT (HOLDINGS) LIMITED Box 206, Westland Works Yeovil Somerset, BA20 2YB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butcher, Raymond Joseph Dairy House Ryme Intrinsica Sherborne, Dorset DT9 6JX / GB | 02 /
Rose, Gerald David 28 Plantagenet Chase Yeovil, Somerset BA20 2PR / GB | [1981/45] | Representative(s) | Jack, Bruce J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/45] | Jack, Bruce James, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81301920.5 | 30.04.1981 | [1981/45] | Priority number, date | GB19800015125 | 07.05.1980 Original published format: GB 8015125 | [1981/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0039586 | Date: | 11.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0039586 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039586 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10 | [1981/45] | CPC: |
F16K11/0708 (EP);
F16K39/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/45] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Druckregelventil | [1981/45] | English: | Hydraulic pressure control valve | [1981/45] | French: | Soupape de commande à pression hydraulique | [1981/45] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/34] | 19.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.09.1984 | FR | 12.09.1984 | IT | 12.09.1984 | SE | 12.09.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.09.1984 | |
IT | 12.09.1984 | ||
SE | 12.09.1984 | ||
Former [1986/12] | BE | 12.09.1984 | |
SE | 12.09.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 12.09.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1148833 ; | [A]US3196891 ; | [A]US3916934 ; | [Y]DE2813618 ; | [Y]US4011888 |