EP0041773 - Solar cell production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | For all designated states ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES, INC. 1675 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | ||
Former [1981/50] | For all designated states ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY 515 South Flower Street Los Angeles California 90071 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izu, Masatsugu 31515 Bellvine Trail Birmingham Michigan 48010 / US | 02 /
Cannella, Vincent D. 19961 Shrewsbury Detroit Michigan 48221 / US | 03 /
Ovshinsky, Stanford R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills Michigan 48013 / US | [1981/50] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/06] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1981/50] | Coleman, Stanley Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302029.4 | 07.05.1981 | [1981/50] | Priority number, date | US19800151301 | 19.05.1980 Original published format: US 151301 | US19810240493 | 16.03.1981 Original published format: US 240493 | [1981/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041773 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041773 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18, H01L21/205 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
H01L31/206 (EP,US);
C23C16/517 (EP,US);
C23C16/54 (EP,US);
H01L31/046 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/50] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Solarzellen | [1981/50] | English: | Solar cell production | [1981/50] | French: | Production de cellules solaires | [1981/50] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 05.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4226898 [ ] (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al); | WO7900776 [ ] (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | US4058418 [ ] (LINDMAYER JOSEPH); | US3925118 [ ] (HOLLAN LASZLO); | US4152535 [ ] (DEMINET CZESLAW [US], et al); | DE2900724 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) |