EP0041774 - Sand reclamation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.1984 [1984/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | For all designated states FOSECO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevenson, John 41 Bedford Road Sutton Coldfield, West Midlands / GB | 02 /
Machin, John 47, Giles Road Lichfield Staffordshire / GB | 03 /
Dyke, David Leslie 6 Ashley Road Erdington Birmingham West Midlands / GB | [1981/50] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence FOSECO MINSEP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Group Patents Department 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | Shaw, Laurence FOSECO MINSEP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Group Patents Department 285 Long Acre Nechells Birmingham B7 5JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302031.0 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/50] | Priority number, date | GB19800018423 | 05.06.1980 Original published format: GB 8018423 | [1981/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041774 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041774 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B22C5/18, B22C1/18 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
B22C5/18 (EP,US);
B22C1/188 (EP,US);
Y10S241/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/50] | Title | German: | Sandregeneration | [1981/50] | English: | Sand reclamation | [1981/50] | French: | Régénération de sable | [1981/50] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 24.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1700713 [ ] (CAMPION EDWARD W, et al); | US2821375 [ ] (ANDREWS ROBERT S L); | US3137046 [ ] (BARLOW THOMAS E, et al); | FR2115097 [ ] (SIGMA APPLIC PRODUITS); | GB1322864 [ ] (DAPPLICATION DE PRODUITS IND E); | DE2252217 [ ] (HALBERGERHUETTE GMBH); | FR2382290 [ ] (TSI T [SU]); | FR2389409 [ ] (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]); | FR2411653 [ ] (RHONE POULENC IND [FR], et al) |