EP0040072 - Apparatus for strip casting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maringer, Robert Edward 815, Greenridge Worthington Ohio 43085 / US | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Sheader, Brian Norman, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | Sheader, Brian N., et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302062.5 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | US19800148440 | 09.05.1980 Original published format: US 148440 | [1981/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040072 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040072 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06, B22D11/00 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
B22D11/005 (EP);
B22D11/06 (KR);
B22D11/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Giessen eines Streifens | [1981/46] | English: | Apparatus for strip casting | [1981/46] | French: | Dispositif pour couler une bande | [1981/46] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/22] | 20.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191026260 (STRANGE EDWARD HALFORD [GB]); | [A]US4142571 (NARASIMHAN MANDAYAM C); | [A]FR2410368 (SHIRO MAEDA PRESIDENT TOHOKU U [JP], et al) |