EP0040080 - Nylon 6 polymer and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1983 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COURTAULDS PLC 18, Hanover Square London W1A 2BB / GB | [1982/40] |
Former [1982/30] | For all designated states COURTAULDS PLC 18, Hanover Square London W1A 2BB / GB | ||
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states COURTAULDS PLC 18, Hanover Square London W1A 2BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cawley, Martin James 8, Alwen Drive Cwm Talwg Barry South Glamorgan / GB | 02 /
Cawley, Christian Margaret 8, Alwen Drive Cwm Talwg Barry South Glamorgan / GB | 03 /
Grice, Kenneth Darling 29 Vernon Close Leamington Spa Warwickshire / GB | 04 /
Tracey, Robert John 20 Kingsley Crescent Bulkington Nuneaton Warwickshire / GB | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Newby, Raymond Laurence, et al J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | [1981/46] | Application number, filing date | 81302076.5 | 11.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | GB19800015637 | 12.05.1980 Original published format: GB 8015637 | [1981/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0040080 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0040080 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/16, C08G69/36, C08L77/02, C08J9/26, D01F6/60 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
D04H1/56 (EP);
C08G69/16 (EP);
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08L77/02 (EP);
D01F6/90 (EP);
D01F8/12 (EP);
D04H1/4334 (EP);
D04H13/00 (EP);
D04H3/16 (EP);
C08J2377/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/46] | Title | German: | Nylon 6-Polymer und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1981/46] | English: | Nylon 6 polymer and process for its manufacture | [1981/46] | French: | Polymère de nylon 6 et procédé pour sa préparation | [1981/46] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/01] | 01.10.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.04.1983 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1286683 ; | [A]DE2313906 ; | [A]GB1390679 |