EP0040082 - Novel substituted oxonicotinates, their use as plant growth regulators and plant growth regulating compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1985 [1985/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlson, Glenn Richard 305 Britt Road North Wales Pennsylvania, 19454 / US | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Wood, Peter Worsley Spencer, et al Rohm and Haas Company Patent Department Chesterfield House Bloomsbury Way London WC1A 2TP / GB | [1981/46] | Application number, filing date | 81302079.9 | 11.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | US19800148079 | 12.05.1980 Original published format: US 148079 | [1982/02] |
Former [1981/46] | US19800148079 | 12.05.1980 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040082 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040082 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/40, C07D213/80, // C07D309/38 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP);
A01H1/026 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP);
C07D309/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/46] | Title | German: | Substituierte Oxonicotinate, ihre Verwendung als Pflanzenwachstumsregulatoren und sie enthaltende Zusammensetzungen für die Regulierung des Pflanzenwachstums | [1981/46] | English: | Novel substituted oxonicotinates, their use as plant growth regulators and plant growth regulating compositions containing them | [1981/46] | French: | Oxonicotinates substitués, leur utilisation comme régulateurs de la croissance des plantes et compositions pour la régulation de la croissance des plantes les contenant | [1981/46] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/23] | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4028084 [ ] (MCNULTY PATRICK J, et al); | US4115101 [ ] (CARLSON GLENN R); | EP0003144 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | GB2029403 [ ] (LILLY CO ELI) |