EP0066017 - Liquid dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.09.1985 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151 Amherst Ohio 44001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151 Amherst Ohio 44001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frates, Paul S. 581 Carithers Road Lawrenceville, Georgia 30245 / US | 02 /
Scholl, Charles H. 3699 Hermitage Drive Duluth, Georgia 30136 / US | [1982/49] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302332.2 | 27.05.1981 | [1982/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066017 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/32, B65B51/02 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
B65B51/023 (EP);
B05B1/306 (EP);
B05C5/0225 (EP);
B29B7/801 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/49] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsabgabevorrichtung | [1982/49] | English: | Liquid dispensing device | [1982/49] | French: | Distributeur de liquide | [1982/49] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 24.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/47] | 17.06.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1985 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE225374 [ ]; | US2983480 [ ] (GREENLIE DAVID G); | DE1403368 [ ] (AUST & SCHUETTLER & CO M A S K); | US3841567 [ ] (VILAGI B, et al); | US3923252 [ ] (WARNING SR WALTER B, et al); | EP0040068 [ ] (NORDSON CORP [US]) |