EP0042225 - Zeolite synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.1985 [1985/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1981/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casci, John Leonello 17 Overdale Close Redcar Cleveland / GB | 02 /
Lowe, Barrie Milner 20 Lussielaw Road Edinburgh 9 / GB | 03 /
Whittam, Thomas Vincent 30 Wilton Drive Darlington Cleveland / GB | [1981/51] | Representative(s) | Martin, David Lincoln, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Martin, David Lincoln, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1981/51] | Stephenson, Kenneth ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302342.1 | 27.05.1981 | [1981/51] | Priority number, date | GB19800019212 | 12.06.1980 Original published format: GB 8019212 | [1981/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042225 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042225 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/28 | [1981/51] | CPC: |
C01B39/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/51] | Title | German: | Zeolithsynthese | [1981/51] | English: | Zeolite synthesis | [1981/51] | French: | Synthèse de zéolithe | [1981/51] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/29] | 31.01.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3702886 [ ] (ARGAUER ROBERT J, et al); | DE2924870 [ ] (SNAM PROGETTI); | GB1334243 [ ] (MOBIL OIL CORP); | GB1553209 [ ] (ICI LTD) |