EP0043184 - Control systems for continuously variable ratio transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1985 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BL TECHNOLOGY LIMITED 35-38 Portman Square London W1H OHQ / GB | [1982/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stubbs, Peter William Robert 6, Minster Close Hampton Magna Warwick CV35 8ST / GB | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Waters, Jeffrey BL Patent and Trade Mark Department Cowley Body Plant Cowley Oxford OX4 5NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | Waters, Jeffrey BL Patent and Trade Mark Department Cowley Body Plant Cowley Oxford OX4 5NL / GB | ||
Former [1982/35] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1982/01] | Hunt, Anthony Edward BL Limited Patent Department Cowley Body Plant Cowley Oxford OX4 5NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302369.4 | 29.05.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | GB19800017895 | 31.05.1980 Original published format: GB 8017895 | [1982/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0043184 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0043184 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043184 | Date: | 20.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16H17/02, F16H15/38, F16H37/00 | [1982/01] | CPC: |
F16H37/086 (EP,US);
F16H15/38 (EP,US);
F16H61/6646 (EP,US);
F16H2015/383 (EP,US);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US);
F16H2061/6614 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/01] | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtungen für stufenlose Übersetzungsgetriebe | [1982/01] | English: | Control systems for continuously variable ratio transmissions | [1982/01] | French: | Circuits de contrôle pour variateurs de vitesse réglables en continu | [1982/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 10.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3313173 (EMMERICH SZODFRIDT, et al); | [A]US3577806 (SCHAEFER ROBERT H); | [A]AT325963B (POLLY JOHANN [AT]); | [A]DE910251 (ARDELTWERKE GMBH); | [A]DE931268 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]DE1173926 (VOITH GMBH J M); | [A]FR1266619 (RENAULT); | [A]FR2058760 (BERLIET AUTOMOBILES); | [AD]GB1078791 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]GB1505817 (BRITISH LEYLAND UK LTD [GB]); | [AD]GB1525861 (MULLARD LTD); | [A]US2913918 (GILL JR ANDREW S) |