EP0050912 - Catalyst and process for the hydrotreating of nitrogen-containing feeds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Standard Oil Company 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | For all designated states Standard Oil Company 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tait, Andrew Martin 5 South 414 N. Columbia Street Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
Nevitt, Thomas Dickey 4 S 757 Karns Road Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 03 /
Hensley, Albert Lloyd, Jr. 1204 35th Street Munster Indiana 46321 / US | [1982/18] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302651.5 | 15.06.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | US19800200544 | 24.10.1980 Original published format: US 200544 | [1982/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050912 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050912 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/88, C10G45/08 | [1982/18] | CPC: |
C10G45/08 (EP);
B01J23/8878 (EP);
B01J21/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/18] | Title | German: | Katalysator und Verfahren zur Hydrobehandlung stickstoffhaltiger Beschickungen | [1982/18] | English: | Catalyst and process for the hydrotreating of nitrogen-containing feeds | [1982/18] | French: | Catalyseur et procédé pour l'hydrotraitement de charges contenant de l'azote | [1982/18] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 16.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.1985 | CH | 02.05.1985 | IT | 02.05.1985 | LI | 02.05.1985 | SE | 30.05.1985 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/18] | AT | 02.05.1985 | |
CH | 02.05.1985 | ||
LI | 02.05.1985 | ||
SE | 30.05.1985 | ||
Former [1988/13] | AT | 02.05.1985 | |
SE | 30.05.1985 | ||
Former [1986/45] | AT | 02.05.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US3004913 [ ] (STANLEY TUCKER); | FR1551473 [ ]; | US3752776 [ ] (CHESTER A, et al); | GB1446175 [ ] (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | GB2011463 [ ] (STANDARD OIL CO); | US4181602 [ ] (HENSLEY ALBERT L JR [US], et al); | US4224144 [ ] (HENSLEY JR ALBERT L, et al); | EP0016599 [ ] (STANDARD OIL CO [US]) | Examination | US4008149 |