EP0048077 - Refillable blade type knife [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okada Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 11-8, Higashi Nakamoto 2-chome Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states Okada Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 11-8, Higashi Nakamoto 2-chome Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Saburo 1-11, Higashi Nakahama 1-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302800.8 | 22.06.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | JP19800130886U | 12.09.1980 Original published format: JP 13088680 U | JP19810074092U | 21.05.1981 Original published format: JP 7409281 U | [1982/36] |
Former [1982/20] | JP19800130886U | 12.09.1980 | |
Former [1982/12] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048077 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048077 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B26B5/00 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
B26B5/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Messer mit auswechselbarer Klinge | [1982/12] | English: | Refillable blade type knife | [1982/12] | French: | Couteau à lame remplaçable | [1982/12] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 29.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3453729 [ ] (LARSON GEORGE G); | US3316635 [ ] (MERROW GEORGE W, et al); | AU457035 [ ] |