EP0043225 - Mechanical pipe joint and method of forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butler Taper Joint, Inc. 2012 Karbach Houston Texas 77092 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | For all designated states Butler Taper Joint, Inc. 2012 Karbach Houston Texas 77092 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butler, Major Gene Rt. 3 Box 390 Huntsville Texas / US | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Bluff, John William, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | Bluff, John William, et al c/o Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302829.7 | 23.06.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | US19810267841 | 05.06.1981 Original published format: US 267841 | US19800162722 | 25.06.1980 Original published format: US 162722 | [1982/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043225 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043225 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/10 | [1982/01] | CPC: |
F16L13/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1982/01] | Title | German: | Mechanische Rohrverbindung und Herstellungsverfahren | [1982/01] | English: | Mechanical pipe joint and method of forming same | [1982/01] | French: | Raccord mécanique de tuyaux et procédé de fabrication | [1982/01] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/39] | 30.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.07.1982 | M02   Fee paid on   22.07.1982 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.07.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1053260 [ ]; | US3909045 [ ]; | GB1279689 [ ]; | DE1222746 [ ]; | DE1032623 [ ]; | US4095825 [ ]; | DE1960764 [ ]; | CH439888 [ ]; | US3606403 [ ] |