EP0043285 - Method for determination of valproic acid and reagents therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.05.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 25, Doshomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | For all designated states Dainippon Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 25, Doshomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunahara, Noriyuki 86-2 Kawashima Arisugawa-cho Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | 02 /
Naruto Shunsuke 7-18 2-chome Asukanokita Ikoma-shi Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Kagemoto, Akira 2-1-620 2-chome Kamiminami Hirano-ku Osaka-shi / JP | 04 /
Kurooka, Shigeru 10-7 3-chome Nonaka Fujiidera-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Yokogawa, Kanae 4-17 3-chome Aogakidai Nara-shi / JP | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1984/01] |
Former [1982/01] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A.Kemp & Co. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London, WC1R 5EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 81302975.8 | 30.06.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | JP19800090403 | 01.07.1980 Original published format: JP 9040380 | [1982/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043285 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0043285 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0043285 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/531, G01N33/535, G01N33/94 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
C07C323/00 (EP,US);
C07C327/00 (EP,US);
C07C69/533 (EP,US);
G01N33/9473 (EP,US);
Y10S435/961 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1982/01] | C07G7/00, G01N33/54 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Reagensmittel zum Bestimmen von Valproinsäure | [1982/01] | English: | Method for determination of valproic acid and reagents therein | [1982/01] | French: | Procédé et réactifs pour la détermination de l'acide valproique | [1982/01] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/26] | 23.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.1984
30.10.1984
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.1984
30.10.1984
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | 08.11.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 14.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.05.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.1987 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.04.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3817837 [ ] (RUBENSTEIN K, et al); | [P]EP0028795 (MILES LAB [US]) | [ ] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 25, no. 6, June 1979, page 1093, abstract no. 155 A. IZUTSU et al.: "Homogeneous enzyme immunoassay for valproic acid in serum" | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 9, 3rd March 1980, page 4, no. 69168c Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. I.C. DIJKHUIS et al.: "Joint international quality control program on the determination of antiepileptic drugs" & PHARM. WEEKBL., SCI. ED. 1979, 1(5), 1171-1204 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 11, 17th March 1980, page 7, no. 87769d Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. K. MIYAMOTO et al.: "Interlaboratory variability in determination of serum antiepileptic drug concentration in Japan" & NO TO HATTATSU 1979, 11(6), 561-566 |