EP0043727 - Surface treatment wheels and shoes for supporting a moving belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RYE MACHINERY LIMITED Lincoln road, High Wycombe Buckinghamshire, HP12 3TR / GB | [1982/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnett, Roger Glen Vista Park Lane Lane End High Wycombe Buckinghamshire / GB | [1982/02] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303082.2 | 06.07.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | GB19800022162 | 07.07.1980 Original published format: GB 8022162 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0043727 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0043727 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B24D9/00 | [1982/02] | CPC: |
B24D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/02] | Title | German: | Scheibe für die Bearbeitung von Oberflächen und Schuhe zum Unterstützen eines beweglichen Schleifbandes | [1982/02] | English: | Surface treatment wheels and shoes for supporting a moving belt | [1982/02] | French: | Roue pour le traitement des surfaces et sabots pour soutenir une bande abrasive en mouvement | [1982/02] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/40] | 09.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/21] | 29.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2038154 [ ]; | US2627705 [ ]; | US1406275 [ ]; | CH412616 [ ]; | GB398725 [ ]; | FR356541 [ ]; | US2465225 [ ]; | US2405328 [ ]; | US2549043 [ ] |