EP0045644 - Metallic contacts to compound semiconductor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santa Barbara Research Center 75 Coromar Drive Goleta California 93117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states Santa Barbara Research Center 75 Coromar Drive Goleta California 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cockrum, Charles A. 7637 Pine Tree Place Goleta California 93107 / US | 02 /
Chia, Joan K. 752 Las Alturas Santa Barbara California 93103 / US | 03 /
Kreider, James F. 1157 Crestline Drive Santa Barbara California 93105 / US | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303521.9 | 31.07.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | US19800174963 | 04.08.1980 Original published format: US 174963 | [1982/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0045644 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0045644 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045644 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/40, // H01L21/285, H01L21/443 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
H01L21/02186 (EP);
H01L21/02244 (EP);
H01L21/02258 (EP);
H01L21/28575 (EP);
H01L21/443 (EP);
H01L21/469 (EP);
H01L23/53209 (EP);
H01L29/45 (EP);
H01L29/452 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/06] | Title | German: | Metallische Kontakte für Mischhalbleiteranordnungen | [1982/06] | English: | Metallic contacts to compound semiconductor devices | [1982/06] | French: | Contacts métalliques pour dispositifs semiconducteurs composés | [1982/06] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/37] | 31.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4085500 (HAGER ROBERT J, et al); | [A]GB1469953 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 4, September 1978, page 1753, New York, USA; P.S. HO et al.: "Stable junctions between GaAs and metal contacts using transition metals as diffusion barriers". |