EP0052921 - Methods and compositions for assaying for the production of 1,4-dihydropyridyl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYVA COMPANY 900 Arastradero Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | For all designated states SYVA COMPANY 900 Arastradero Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Mae Wan-Leng 1337 Elsona Court Sunnyvale California / US | 02 /
Colvin, Floyd Warren 667 MacArthur Avenue Redwood City California / US | 03 /
Ullman, Edwin Fisher 135 Selby Lane Atherton California / US | [1982/22] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1982/22] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304090.4 | 08.09.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | US19800209365 | 24.11.1980 Original published format: US 209365 | [1982/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052921 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0052921 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K39/385, G01N33/54 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
G01N33/531 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/968 (EP,US);
Y10S436/808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/30] |
Former [1982/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zum Testen bei der Gewinnung von 1,4-Dihydropyridyl | [1982/22] | English: | Methods and compositions for assaying for the production of 1,4-dihydropyridyl | [1982/22] | French: | Méthodes et compositions pour test dans la production de 1,4 dihydropyridyle | [1982/22] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LI, LU, NL | 29.04.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/50] | 28.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.11.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 24.11.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 24.11.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 24.11.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 24.11.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2397449 [ ] (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | US3852157 [ ] (RUBENSTEIN K, et al); | GB1552607 [ ] (MILES LAB); | FR2299644 [ ] (AKZO NV [NL]); | GB1532694 [ ] (AKZO NV) | [ ] - Journal of Immunology, Vol. 116, No. 4, April 1976, Baltimore, (US) KAM S. TSE et al.: "Antibodies Specific to Isoniazid and Isonicotinic Acid" pages 965-969 * Materials and Methods pages 965-967 * | [ ] - Biochemistry, Vol. 7, No. 4, April 1968, Easton P.A. (US) H. VAN VUNAKIS et al.: "Production of Antibodies with Specificity Toward Adenosine, Uridine, and Ribose 5'-Phospahtes" pages 1265-1270 * Abstract; page 1269, left-hand column, line 18 - right-hand column, line 18; page 1270, left-hand column, lines 6-52 * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 19, May 8, 1978, page 186, Abstract 132542e Columbus, Ohio (US) A. BAICI et al.: "Fluorescence Properties of Reduced Thionicotinamide-Adenine Dinucleotide and of its Complex with Octopine Dehydrogenase" & Eur. J. Biochem 1978, 83(2) 601-607 * Abstract * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 82, No. 3, January 20, 1975, page 171, Abstract 12790p Columbus, Ohio (US) I.P. TRAYER et al.: "Preparation of Adenosine Nucleotide Derivatives Suitable for Affinity Chromatography" & Biochem. J. 1974, 139(3) 609-23 * Abstract * | Examination | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology Vol. 1, Immunochemistry, D.M. Weir, 3rd Ed. 1979, pages 18.10 -18.11 |