EP0048579 - Method for the electro-deposition of lead alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/13] | Method and apparatus for the electro-deposition of lead alloys | ||
[1984/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1985 [1985/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN VANDERVELL LIMITED Norden Road Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 4BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states GKN VANDERVELL LIMITED Norden Road Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 4BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waterman, William John 'Dalegarth' Wendover Road Bourne End Bucks / GB | 02 /
Brook, Miachel Gordon 46 Compton Crescent Chessington Surrey / GB | 03 /
Jenni, Lita Elizabeth 34 Dunwood Court Boyn Valley Road Maidenhead Berks / GB | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Thorpe, Brian, et al Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | Thorpe, Brian, et al Guest Keen and Nettlefolds plc Group Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 55 Ipsley House Ipsley Church Lane Redditch Worcestershire B98 0TL / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304194.4 | 14.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | GB19800030638 | 23.09.1980 Original published format: GB 8030638 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0048579 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048579 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/56, C25D17/10, C25D17/02, C25C7/04 | [1982/13] | CPC: |
C25D3/56 (EP);
C25D17/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur galvanischen Abscheidung von Bleilegierungen | [1984/51] | English: | Method for the electro-deposition of lead alloys | [1984/51] | French: | Procédé pour le dépôt électrolytique d'alliages de plomb | [1984/51] |
Former [1982/13] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die galvanische Abscheidung von Bleilegierungen | ||
Former [1982/13] | Method and apparatus for the electro-deposition of lead alloys | ||
Former [1982/13] | Procédé et appareil pour le dépôt électrolytique d'alliages de plomb | Examination procedure | 28.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 13.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB577335 [ ] (VANDERVELL PRODUCTS LTD); | GB628459 [ ] (CLEVELAND GRAPHITE BRONZE CO); | GB679947 [ ] (CLEVELAND GRAPHITE BRONZE CO); | US2793990 [ ] (ERICH HEYMANN, et al); | US3616305 [ ] (ARBEZ JEAN P); | GB2007713 [ ] (DIPSOL CHEM); | US4217198 [ ] (KADIJA IGOR V [US], et al) | [ ] - METAL FINISHING, vol. 74, no. 1, January 1976, METALS AND PLASTICS PUBLICATIONS, INC., Hackensach, N.J. USA Pages 30-34 * Page 34, especially "Lead Alloy Deposition " * |