EP0048158 - Interceptor tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1983 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1984 [1984/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purtell, Norman Wilfrid Longdon Lowe Lane Wolverley Kidderminster Worcestershire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | For all designated states Purtell, Norman Wilfrid Longdon Lowe Lane Wolverley Kidderminster Worcestershire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/12] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Samuel H., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/12] | Lewis, Samuel Hewitt, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81304205.8 | 15.09.1981 | [1982/12] | Priority number, date | GB19800029973 | 17.09.1980 Original published format: GB 8029973 | [1982/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0048158 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0048158 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/16 | [1982/12] | CPC: |
E03F5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1982/12] | Title | German: | Auffangbehälter | [1982/12] | English: | Interceptor tank | [1982/12] | French: | Réservoir d'interception | [1982/12] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/07] | 14.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2348892 ; | [A]DE1126760 ; | [A]US3862039 ; | [E]CH627087 |