EP0050417 - Circuit arrangement including an opto-isolator device for checking the state of an electric switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/17] | Opto-isolator device | ||
[1990/10] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Black, Jr., Robert A. 7007 Girard Avenue North Brooklyn Center Minnesota 55430 / US | [1982/17] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1989/38] |
Former [1984/45] | Harman, Michael Godfrey Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | ||
Former [1982/17] | Riddle, John Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell, Berks. / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304267.8 | 17.09.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | US19800197888 | 17.10.1980 Original published format: US 197888 | [1982/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050417 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/04, H03K17/18, G08B21/00 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
H01H9/167 (EP,US);
H03K17/18 (EP,US);
H03K17/7955 (EP,US);
H04B10/802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/17] | Title | German: | Eine Optokoppler-Einrichtung umfassende Schaltungsanordnung zur Zustandsüberwachung eines elektrischen Schalters | [1990/10] | English: | Circuit arrangement including an opto-isolator device for checking the state of an electric switch | [1990/10] | French: | Agencement de circuit comprenant un dispositif isolateur optique pour vérifier l'état d'un interrupteur électrique | [1990/10] |
Former [1982/17] | Opto-Isolator-Einrichtung | ||
Former [1982/17] | Opto-isolator device | ||
Former [1982/17] | Dispositif isolateur optique | File destroyed: | 10.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/49] | 28.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/01] | 25.07.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/01] | 18.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 15.03.1985 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of representative | 18.07.1986 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | US3421156 [ ] (ROWELL WILLIAM G); | US3387135 [ ] (ENGH ROBERT O); | DE2614748 [ ] (BAUM ELEKTROPHYSIK GMBH) |