EP0049964 - Ground engaging members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.1983 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTLAND plc Westland Works Yeovil Somerset / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/16] | For all designated states WESTLAND plc Westland Works Yeovil Somerset / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deady, Martin Albert Westmoor View Owl Street East Lambrook South Petherton Somerset / GB | [1982/16] | Representative(s) | Jack, Bruce J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/16] | Jack, Bruce James, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81304392.4 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/16] | Priority number, date | GB19800032975 | 13.10.1980 Original published format: GB 8032975 | [1982/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049964 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049964 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B64C25/32, B64C25/66 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
B64C25/32 (EP);
B64C25/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/16] | Title | German: | Landevorrichtung | [1982/16] | English: | Ground engaging members | [1982/16] | French: | Train d'atterrissage | [1982/16] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/29] | 15.04.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1484751 ; | [XD]GB993847 ; | [X]US2843345 ; | [A]US2101399 ; | [AD]US3168155 ; | [AD]US2488310 ; | [A]US3208707 ; | [A]DE1203613 |