Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1986 [1986/01] |
26.10.1984 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.12.1984 [1984/52] |
01.07.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.09.1982 [1982/35] |
06.02.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.04.1982 [1982/14] |