EP0051917 - Benzofuran ethanolamine derivatives, processes for their preparation, and their use in medicine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferris, Michael John 35 Belmont Road Belmont Sutton Surrey / GB | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Russell, Brian John, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Russell, Brian John, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304398.1 | 23.09.1981 | [1982/20] | Priority number, date | GB19800031228 | 26.09.1980 Original published format: GB 8031228 | [1982/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051917 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051917 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/81, C07D307/80, C07D407/04, A61K31/34 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
C07D307/81 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1982/20] | Title | German: | Benzofuran-äthanolaminderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in der Medizin | [1982/20] | English: | Benzofuran ethanolamine derivatives, processes for their preparation, and their use in medicine | [1982/20] | French: | Dérivés de benzofuranne-éthanolamine, leurs procédés de préparation et leur usage en médicine | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 21.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3452052 [ ] (BINON FERNAND, et al); | US3929836 [ ] (FOTHERGILL GRAHAM ALWYN, et al); | US3972900 [ ] (FOTHERGILL GRAHAM ALWYN, et al) | Examination | DE2655233 | EP0029230 |