EP0049175 - Elastomeric composition; method for its production; and suspension bushings formed therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1986 [1986/25] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1982/23] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1982/14] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
Ford France Société Anonyme 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabar, Ronald James 73 East Hadley Road Amherst Mass. 01002 / US | 02 /
Lemieux, Marvin Alan 19229 Nadol Drive Southfield Michigan 48075 / US | 03 /
Killgoar, Paul Charles 15455 Ashurst Street Livonia Michigan 48154 / US | [1982/14] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/06] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | ||
Former [1982/14] | Drakeford, Robert William Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304556.4 | 01.10.1981 | [1982/14] | Priority number, date | US19800192781 | 01.10.1980 Original published format: US 192781 | US19800192782 | 01.10.1980 Original published format: US 192782 | [1982/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049175 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049175 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049175 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C08L21/00, // (C08L21/00, 23:20) | [1982/14] | CPC: |
C08L21/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/14] | Title | German: | Elastomermischung, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und daraus geformte Aufhängungsbuchsen | [1982/14] | English: | Elastomeric composition; method for its production; and suspension bushings formed therefrom | [1982/14] | French: | Composition élastomère, méthode pour sa production; et manchons de suspension formés de celle-ci | [1982/14] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/08] | 01.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2402680 [ ]; | DE1167677 [ ]; | GB673962 [ ] | [ ] - RUBBER CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, Vol. 53, No. 2, 1980, Rubber Division of the American Chemical Society Inc., Lancaster, Pens, (US), W.W. PARIS: "Improved Service life of Automotive Suspension Bushings through the use of Semiefficient Vulcanization Systems", pages 368-376 |