EP0049613 - Method of bonding a plastics body to metal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hargreaves, Charles R. 3040 County Road 90 Maple Plain Minnesota 55359 / US | 02 /
Price, Stephen J. 3327 Adair Avenue North Crystal Minnesota 55422 / US | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Honeywell Control Systems Limited, Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | ||
Former [1989/39] | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1985/12] | Harman, Michael Godfrey Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | ||
Former [1982/15] | Riddle, John Honeywell Control Systems Ltd. Patent Department Charles Square Bracknell, Berks. / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304563.0 | 02.10.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | US19800193680 | 03.10.1980 Original published format: US 193680 | [1982/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049613 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049613 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049613 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B05D3/00, B05D7/14, B32B15/08, F42B14/00 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B29C45/14811 (EP);
B32B3/30 (US);
B32B38/0036 (US);
B05D1/08 (EP);
B05D2350/65 (EP);
B29L2009/008 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/16] | B29F1/10, B05D3/00, B05D7/14, B32B15/08, F42B31/00 | ||
Former IPC [1982/15] | B29F1/10, B05D3/00, B05D7/14, B32B15/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1982/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Binden eines Kunststoffkörpers an ein Metall | [1982/15] | English: | Method of bonding a plastics body to metal | [1982/15] | French: | Procédé pour lier un corps en matière plastique à un métal | [1982/15] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 25.06.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/01] | 18.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/06] | 25.07.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/06] | 11.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 25.02.1985 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of representative | 18.07.1986 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3910194 ; | [A]FR1508851 ; | [A]US4024008 ; | [A]AU481742B ; | [AD]GB1309471 |