blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0050923

EP0050923 - Polyacrylate thickening agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.1984
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CELANESE CORPORATION
1211 Avenue of the Americas New York
New York 10036 / US
[N/P]
Former [1982/18]For all designated states
CELANESE CORPORATION
1211 Avenue of the Americas
New York New York 10036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dammann, Laurence G.
5604 Montfort Lane
Crestwood Kentucky / US
[1982/18]
Representative(s)De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1982/18]
Application number, filing date81304596.005.10.1981
[1982/18]
Priority number, dateUS1980019600910.10.1980         Original published format: US 196009
US1981024816430.03.1981         Original published format: US 248164
[1982/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0050923
Date:05.05.1982
Language:EN
[1982/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0050923
Date:27.10.1982
Language:EN
[1982/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.1982
ClassificationIPC:C08F220/04, C09D7/00, C08L33/00, // (C08F220/04, 220:26, 216:14)
[1982/18]
CPC:
C09D11/03 (EP,US); C08F220/04 (EP,US); C09D7/43 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,US); Y10S526/932 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08F220/04, C08F220/26, C08F216/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1982/18]
TitleGerman:Polyacrylat als Verdickungsmittel[1982/18]
English:Polyacrylate thickening agents[1982/18]
French:Agent épaississant polyacrylique[1982/18]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure01.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/24]
01.05.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1984/48]
15.06.1984Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1984/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.198303   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1042496  (CELANESE CORP);
 [AD]US4167502  (LEWIS SHELDON N, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.