EP0049634 - Wind powered turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIR ROBERT MCALPINE AND SONS (TRADE INVESTMENTS) LIMITED 40 Bernard Street London, W.C.1 / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | For all designated states SIR ROBERT MCALPINE AND SONS (TRADE INVESTMENTS) LIMITED 40 Bernard Street London, W.C.1 / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allan, John Skanor West Hill Bembridge Isle of Wight / GB | 02 /
Musgrove, Peter James 32 Radstock Lane Earley Reading Berks. RG6 2QL / GB | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [1982/15] | Application number, filing date | 81304623.2 | 06.10.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | GB19800032238 | 07.10.1980 Original published format: GB 8032238 | [1982/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0049634 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049634 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06, F03D7/06 | [1982/15] | CPC: |
F03D7/06 (EP,US);
F03D3/064 (EP,US);
F05B2240/214 (EP,US);
F05B2240/218 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Windrad | [1982/15] | English: | Wind powered turbine | [1982/15] | French: | Eolienne | [1982/15] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/47] | 12.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2319028 [ ] (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | FR2442978 [ ] (FALLY JACQUES); | GB2035468 [ ] (PI SPECIALIST ENGS LTD); | DE2546884 [ ] (GOSLICH HANS DIETRICH) |